U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03340
  • Case Name: Perry v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.