U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01838-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 30, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.