U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moody
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Preliminary and Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.