U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jolly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment in a Petty Offense Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Information - Petty before USMJ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.