U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthews
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment in a Petty Offense Case]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Information - Petty before USMJ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.