U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03341
  • Case Name: Butler v. Sullivan et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 09, 2023: [Withdraw]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 20, 2022: [Motion Referred]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 12, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • September 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.