U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01839-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooper
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 30, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 10, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.