U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01861-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.