U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01858-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardnett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.