U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01849-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.