U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01848-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wetshongombe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Document]
  • October 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.