U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01846-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.