U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01845-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.