U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01844-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.