U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01842-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCauley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 01, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.