U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02161
  • Case Name: McCauley v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 04, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.