U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03344
  • Case Name: Brown v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Referred]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.