U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03343
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Wake County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.