U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02162
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Evans
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.