U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Racioppi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.