U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03345
  • Case Name: Church v. Tubbs et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.