U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00023
  • Case Name: Ziegler et al v. Polaris Industries Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on MC-Motion to Quash]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Memorandum/Brief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [MC-Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.