U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03347
  • Case Name: Mosby v. Bullard et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.