U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03348
  • Case Name: Newman v. Pender Correctional Institution
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 12, 2022: [Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.