U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01864-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.