U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01869-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.