U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01870-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans-Cook
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • September 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.