U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gabert
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.