U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03350
  • Case Name: Estes v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 21, 2022: [Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.