U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03353
  • Case Name: Carrington v. Scarantino et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 23, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.