U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01802-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riascos-Homez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.