U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01873-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.