U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01883-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • October 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.