U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00370-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAWSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 12, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arrest]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.