U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03355
  • Case Name: Speller v. Augst
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 21, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.