U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01894-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Castro
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 28, 2022: [Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.