U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03361
  • Case Name: Hudson v. Shaw et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.