U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03359
  • Case Name: Neal v. Frett et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Statement of Material Facts]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 04, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 04, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.