U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01904-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sawyer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.