U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clabough
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2022: [Determine Competency to Stand Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [1Fox Case Reassigned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.