U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mc-00002
  • Case Name: Mauriello et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 14, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.