U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02167
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Danforth
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 03, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.