U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01934-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.