U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00470-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huffman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.