U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mc-00003
  • Case Name: Bishop et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice-other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.