U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mc-00023
  • Case Name: Congress v. Oasis at Heritage et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Self-Representation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.