U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03364
  • Case Name: Cooper v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Document]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 06, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 03, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 03, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.