U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01930-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Payne
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.