U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01927-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greiner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.