U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01926-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farrell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.